Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Jo Anne Bernal filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case against Elliott, Patrick James, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 29, 2018 |
CategoryBond Forfeiture |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Request Doc ID# 7 | |
December 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Bill of Cost Doc ID# 6 | |
November 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 5 | |
July 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Answer Doc ID# 4 | |
July 05, 2018 | Docket Event | CitationElliott, Patrick James Returned Unserved 07/18/2018Returned07/18/2018Merrill Bail BondsServed07/09/2018Response Received07/09/2018Returned07/12/2018 | |
June 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Information Sheet Doc ID# 2 | |
June 29, 2018 | Docket Event | E-File Event Original Filing | |
June 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Judgment Nisi (OCA) Doc ID# 1 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.