Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Office Of The Attorney General, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Pelletier, Karen A. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePelletier, Karen A. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2017 |
CategoryTitle Iv-D Paternity |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Hearing (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Pelletier, Karen A.) Result: Non-Suited
Judge: Pelletier, Karen A. |
|
November 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Non-Suit Doc ID# 9 | |
November 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent Dismiss Doc ID# 8 (Judicial Officer: Pelletier, Karen A. )
Judge: : Pelletier, Karen A. |
|
November 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Pelletier, Karen A.) Result: Passed
Judge: Pelletier, Karen A. |
|
August 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Court Status Check (2:45 PM) (Judicial Officer Herrera, Mike)
Judge: Herrera, Mike |
|
August 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Referral Order Doc ID# 7 (Judicial Officer: Herrera, Mike )
Judge: : Herrera, Mike |
|
February 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Referral Order Doc ID# 6 (Judicial Officer: Gonzalez, Phyllis )
Judge: : Gonzalez, Phyllis |
|
February 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Gonzalez, Phyllis) 02/15/2018Reset by Court to 03/13/201803/13/2018Reset by Court to 02/15/2018
Judge: Gonzalez, Phyllis |
|
February 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Waiver of Service Doc ID# 5 | |
January 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Precept to ServeVILLANUEVA, DAVID ARMANDOServed01/05/2018Response Due01/29/2018Returned01/09/2018 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.