Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Office Of The Attorney General, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Rodriguez, Antonio presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 01, 2017 |
CategoryTitle Iv-D Parent Child |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed For Want Of Prosecution |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Hearing (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Rodriguez, Antonio)
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
February 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Parent Child Relationship Hearing (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Rodriguez, Antonio)
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
February 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 6 (Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Antonio )
Judge: : Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
December 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 5 (Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Antonio )
Judge: : Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
December 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Rodriguez, Antonio)
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
December 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
CitationAVELAR, NADINESTEPHANIE ARLENEServed12/15/2017Response Due01/08/2018Returned12/20/2017
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
November 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
CitationRAPPLEY, RICHARD WILLIAM, III Returned Unserved 12/12/2017Returned12/12/2017
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
November 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 4 (Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Antonio )
Judge: : Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
November 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Petition in Suit Affecting Parent-Child Relationship Doc ID# 1
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
November 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Case Information Sheet Doc ID# 3
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.