Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ogaz, Luis, filed a(n) Deceptive Trade Practices - Consumer case represented by William Nelson Allan, Iv, against Certain Underwriters At Lloyd'S London, represented by Frank Piccolo, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Perez, Annabell presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2016 |
CategoryDeceptive Trade Practices |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaConsumer |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeDeceptive Trade Practices |
Case Outcome TypeOrder For Non-Suit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion for Non Suit Doc ID# 8
Judge: Perez, Annabell |
|
February 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service Doc ID# 7
Judge: Perez, Annabell |
|
January 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Answer Doc ID# 6
Judge: Perez, Annabell |
|
January 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Plea Doc ID# 5
Judge: Perez, Annabell |
|
December 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
CitationCertain Underwriters at Lloyd's LondonServed01/03/2017Response Received01/24/2017Returned01/06/2017
Judge: Perez, Annabell |
|
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Case Information Sheet Doc ID# 2
Judge: Perez, Annabell |
|
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Letter Doc ID# 3
Judge: Perez, Annabell |
|
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
E-File Event Original Filing
Judge: Perez, Annabell |
|
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) Doc ID# 1
Judge: Perez, Annabell |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.