Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Jo Anne Bernal filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Novella, Brian Adan, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with : Gonzalez, Jose M presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2016 |
CategoryProtective Orders |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Information Sheet Doc ID# 13 | |
March 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Copy Doc ID# 14 | |
March 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Change Doc ID# 12 | |
May 08, 2017 | Docket Event | FRD-FEE-CIV | |
March 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Returned Mail Doc ID# 11 | |
February 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Copy Doc ID# 10 | |
February 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Information Sheet Doc ID# 9 | |
January 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
Amended Doc ID# 7 (Judicial Officer: Gonzalez, Jose M )
Judge: : Gonzalez, Jose M |
|
January 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Default Judgment Doc ID# 8 | |
January 05, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Default Judgment Doc ID# 6 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.