Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Office Of The Attorney General, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Rodriguez, Antonio presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 19, 2016 |
CategoryTitle Iv-D Parent Child |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
FRD-FEE-CIV
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
January 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Last Address Doc ID# 20
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
January 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Default Judgment Doc ID# 21
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
January 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Hearing (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Rodriguez, Antonio)
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
January 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
November 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Modification Hearing (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Rodriguez, Antonio)
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
November 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent Dismiss Doc ID# 19 (Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Antonio )
Judge: : Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
November 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Precept to ServeTISDALE, ROSALIND Returned Unserved 11/09/2016Returned11/09/2016
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
November 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
CitationTISDALE, ROSALIND Returned Unserved 11/09/2016Returned11/09/2016
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
October 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 17 (Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Antonio )
Judge: : Rodriguez, Antonio |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.