Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Martinez, Yolanda, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Rolando Morales, against Farmers Texas County Mutual Insurance Company, represented by Raymond Joseph Baeza, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Alvarez, Javier presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 09, 2015 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeNonsuit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial CANCELED Jury Trial (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Alvarez, Javier) Dismissed Judge: Alvarez, Javier |
|
June 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Hearing CANCELED Pre-Trial Hearing (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Alvarez, Javier) Dismissed Judge: Alvarez, Javier |
|
April 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Doc ID# 38
Judge: Alvarez, Javier |
|
October 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent to Use Doc ID# 34
Judge: Alvarez, Javier |
|
October 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent to Use Doc ID# 35
Judge: Alvarez, Javier |
|
October 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent to Use Doc ID# 33
Judge: Alvarez, Javier |
|
October 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent to Use Doc ID# 32
Judge: Alvarez, Javier |
|
October 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order
Judge: Alvarez, Javier |
|
October 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order in Limine Doc ID# 30
Judge: Alvarez, Javier |
|
October 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Jury Trial Doc ID# 31
Judge: Alvarez, Javier |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.