Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Office Of The Attorney General, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Rodriguez, Antonio presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 2015 |
CategoryTitle Iv-D Paternity |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Rodriguez, Antonio) 02/24/2016Reset by Court to 04/06/2016
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
February 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 5 (Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Antonio )
Judge: : Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
January 11, 2016 | Docket Event | Precept to ServeMUNIZ, LUIS ALBERTO Returned Unserved 02/24/2016Returned02/24/2016 | |
January 11, 2016 | Docket Event | CitationMUNIZ, LUIS ALBERTO Returned Unserved 02/24/2016Returned02/24/2016 | |
January 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 3 (Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Antonio )
Judge: : Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
December 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Information Sheet Doc ID# 2 | |
December 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Petition for Paternity Doc ID# 1 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.