Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Holguin, Saul, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Montalvo, Rosa, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Leverton, Reed presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 2015 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed For Want Of Prosecution |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Dismissal Hearing Doc ID# 9
Judge: Leverton, Reed |
|
August 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Doc ID# 8 (Judicial Officer: Leverton, Reed )
Judge: : Leverton, Reed |
|
August 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Dismiss Want of Prosecution (11:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Leverton, Reed)
Judge: Leverton, Reed |
|
May 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Dismissal Hearing Doc ID# 7
Judge: Leverton, Reed |
|
May 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent to Dismiss for Want of Prosecution Doc ID# 6 (Judicial Officer: Leverton, Reed )
Judge: : Leverton, Reed |
|
December 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
Dismiss Want of Prosecution CANCELED Dismiss Want of Prosecution (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Leverton, Reed) Agreed Judge: Leverton, Reed |
|
January 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
Referral Order Doc ID# 5 (Judicial Officer: Strathmann, Laura )
Judge: : Strathmann, Laura |
|
December 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
Case Screening Instrument Doc ID# 4
Judge: Leverton, Reed |
|
December 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
E-File Event Original Filing
Judge: Leverton, Reed |
|
December 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
Case Information Sheet Doc ID# 3
Judge: Leverton, Reed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.