Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Office Of The Attorney General, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Gonzalez, Phyllis presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 17, 2015 |
CategoryTitle Iv-D Paternity |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeDismissal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Doc ID# 14 (Judicial Officer: Gonzalez, Phyllis )
Judge: : Gonzalez, Phyllis |
|
May 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Gonzalez, Phyllis) 02/18/2016Reset by Court to 04/12/201604/12/2016Reset by Court to 05/19/2016
Judge: Gonzalez, Phyllis |
|
May 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Doc ID# 13 (Judicial Officer: Gonzalez, Phyllis )
Judge: : Gonzalez, Phyllis |
|
April 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent Dismiss Doc ID# 12 (Judicial Officer: Gonzalez, Phyllis )
Judge: : Gonzalez, Phyllis |
|
April 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service Doc ID# 11
Judge: Gonzalez, Phyllis |
|
April 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service Doc ID# 10
Judge: Gonzalez, Phyllis |
|
March 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
CitationJONES, KATARUSServed03/23/2016Response Due04/18/2016Returned04/01/2016
Judge: Gonzalez, Phyllis |
|
March 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Precept to ServeJONES, KATARUSServed03/23/2016Response Due04/18/2016Returned04/01/2016
Judge: Gonzalez, Phyllis |
|
March 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Precept to ServeLEE, JERMAINE MONTGOMERY Unserved
Judge: Gonzalez, Phyllis |
|
March 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Precept to ServeJONES, BRANDI SHANTE Unserved
Judge: Gonzalez, Phyllis |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.