Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Marquez, Ramiro, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Marquez, Amber, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with : Gutierrez, Yahara L. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 08, 2015 |
CategoryProtective Orders |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 18, 2016 | Docket Event | Letter Doc ID# 10 | |
January 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Information Sheet Doc ID# 8 | |
January 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Copy Doc ID# 9 | |
January 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Nunc Pro Tunc Doc ID# 7 (Judicial Officer: Gutierrez, Yahara L. )
Judge: : Gutierrez, Yahara L. |
|
December 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Motion for Judgment Nunc Pro Tunc Doc ID# 6 | |
December 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Protective Order Hearing (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Locke, Michele L.) Result: Granted
Judge: Locke, Michele L. |
|
December 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice to Show CauseMARQUEZ, AMBERServed12/10/2015Returned12/10/2015 | |
December 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause (OCA) Doc ID# 4 (Judicial Officer: Locke, Michele L. )
Judge: : Locke, Michele L. |
|
December 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Information Sheet Doc ID# 3 | |
December 08, 2015 | Docket Event | E-File Event Original Filing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.