Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Office Of The Attorney General, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Rodriguez, Antonio presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 10, 2015 |
CategoryTitle Iv-D Parent Child |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Rodriguez, Antonio) 08/24/2015Reset by Court to 10/14/2015
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
August 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 6 (Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Antonio )
Judge: : Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
July 14, 2015 | Docket Event | CitationMarquez, Jesus AlejandroServed07/21/2015Response Due08/17/2015Returned07/22/2015 | |
July 14, 2015 | Docket Event | Precept to ServeMarquez, Jesus AlejandroServed07/21/2015Response Due08/17/2015Returned07/22/2015 | |
July 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 4 (Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Antonio )
Judge: : Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
July 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Petition in Suit Affecting Parent-Child Relationship Doc ID# 1 | |
July 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Information Sheet Doc ID# 3 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.