Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Border Bail Bonds filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case against Gaytan, Alejandro, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Gonzalo Garcia presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGonzalo Garcia Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 07, 2015 |
CategoryDc Bond Forfeiture |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing CANCELED Final Hearing (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Garcia, Gonzalo) Settled Judge: Garcia, Gonzalo |
|
October 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
Bill of Cost Index # 11 Bill of Cost Index # 11 Judge: Garcia, Gonzalo |
|
October 22, 2015 | Docket Event | Bill of Cost Doc ID# 11 | |
July 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
Amended Judgment Nisi Index # 10 Amended Judgment Nisi Index # 10 Judge: Garcia, Gonzalo |
|
July 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Amended Judgment Nisi Doc ID# 10 | |
July 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Amended Answer Index # 9 Amended Answer Index # 9 Judge: Garcia, Gonzalo |
|
July 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Amended Answer Doc ID# 9 | |
July 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion to Amend Index # 8 Motion to Amend Index # 8 Judge: Garcia, Gonzalo |
|
July 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Motion to Amend Doc ID# 8 | |
June 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Index # 7 Order Setting Hearing Index # 7 Judge: Garcia, Gonzalo |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.