Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
City Of El Paso, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Carmen Irene Perez, against Guajardo, Enrique, Guajardo, Dominguez Jessica, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Villa, Carlos JudgmentAwarded To: CITY OF EL PASOAwarded Against: ENRIQUE GUAJARDO, et al presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVilla, Carlos JudgmentAwarded To: CITY OF EL PASOAwarded Against: ENRIQUE GUAJARDO, et al Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 03, 2014 |
CategoryTax Suit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Release of Judgment Doc ID# 9
Judge: Villa, Carlos JudgmentAwarded To: CITY OF EL PASOAwarded Against: ENRIQUE GUAJARDO, et al |
|
July 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Default Judgment Doc ID# 7
Judge: Villa, Carlos JudgmentAwarded To: CITY OF EL PASOAwarded Against: ENRIQUE GUAJARDO, et al |
|
July 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Default Judgment Doc ID# 8
Judge: Villa, Carlos JudgmentAwarded To: CITY OF EL PASOAwarded Against: ENRIQUE GUAJARDO, et al |
|
July 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Default Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Villa, Carlos)
Judge: Villa, Carlos JudgmentAwarded To: CITY OF EL PASOAwarded Against: ENRIQUE GUAJARDO, et al |
|
July 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion to Set Aside Judgment (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Chew, Linda)
Judge: Villa, Carlos JudgmentAwarded To: CITY OF EL PASOAwarded Against: ENRIQUE GUAJARDO, et al |
|
July 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order to Set Aside
Judge: Villa, Carlos JudgmentAwarded To: CITY OF EL PASOAwarded Against: ENRIQUE GUAJARDO, et al |
|
June 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Default Judgment Doc ID# 6
Judge: Villa, Carlos JudgmentAwarded To: CITY OF EL PASOAwarded Against: ENRIQUE GUAJARDO, et al |
|
June 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Default Judgment Doc ID# 5
Judge: Villa, Carlos JudgmentAwarded To: CITY OF EL PASOAwarded Against: ENRIQUE GUAJARDO, et al |
|
June 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Last Address Doc ID# 4
Judge: Villa, Carlos JudgmentAwarded To: CITY OF EL PASOAwarded Against: ENRIQUE GUAJARDO, et al |
|
June 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion to Set Aside Doc ID# 3
Judge: Villa, Carlos JudgmentAwarded To: CITY OF EL PASOAwarded Against: ENRIQUE GUAJARDO, et al |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.