Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
City Of El Paso, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Carmen Irene Perez, against Mena, Amalia, represented by Daniel Mena, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Chew, Linda presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChew, Linda Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 03, 2014 |
CategoryTax Suit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeOrder For Non-Suit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion for Non Suit Doc ID# 9
Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
July 31, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order
Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
July 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Chew, Linda)
Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
July 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion for Abatement Doc ID# 8
Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
June 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order Resetting Hearing Doc ID# 7
Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
May 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 6
Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
May 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Chew, Linda)
Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
April 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 5
Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
December 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
Answer Doc ID# 4
Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
December 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
CitationMENA, AMALIAServed12/29/2014Response Received12/30/2014Returned12/30/2014
Judge: Chew, Linda |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.