Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
City Of El Paso, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Carmen Irene Perez, against Reyes, Patrico, Jr., in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Villa, Carlos presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVilla, Carlos Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 03, 2014 |
CategoryTax Suit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeOrder For Non-Suit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion for Non Suit Doc ID# 4
Judge: Villa, Carlos |
|
July 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
CitationREYES, PATRICO, Jr. Returned Unserved 12/07/2015Returned12/07/2015
Judge: Villa, Carlos |
|
July 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
CitationCompass BankServed07/14/2015Returned07/20/2015
Judge: Villa, Carlos |
|
July 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Amended Petition Doc ID# 3
Judge: Villa, Carlos |
|
December 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
CitationREYES, PATRICO Returned Unserved 04/16/2015Returned04/16/2015
Judge: Villa, Carlos |
|
December 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) Doc ID# 1
Judge: Villa, Carlos |
|
December 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
E-File Event Original Filing
Judge: Villa, Carlos |
|
December 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Case Information Sheet Doc ID# 2
Judge: Villa, Carlos |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.