Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gardea, Vanessa L., filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by George P Andritsos, against St. Clement'S Parish School, Inc., St. Clement'S Parish School, represented by Michael Mcqueen, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Rangel, Bonnie presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 08, 2014 |
CategoryWrongful Termination |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
Case Outcome TypeDismissal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment Sent
Judge: Rangel, Bonnie |
|
April 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Entry of Judgment/Dismissal Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Rangel, Bonnie)
Judge: Rangel, Bonnie |
|
March 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order of Court Setting
Judge: Rangel, Bonnie |
|
March 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Rangel, Bonnie)
Judge: Rangel, Bonnie |
|
March 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Hearing (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Rangel, Bonnie)
Judge: Rangel, Bonnie |
|
February 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Rangel, Bonnie)
Judge: Rangel, Bonnie |
|
January 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine Doc ID# 13
Judge: Rangel, Bonnie |
|
December 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
Witness List Doc ID# 12
Judge: Rangel, Bonnie |
|
December 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Witness List Doc ID# 11
Judge: Rangel, Bonnie |
|
December 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order for Referral to Mediation
Judge: Rangel, Bonnie |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.