Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Acevedo Faivre, Mauricio Edson, filed a(n) Other Civil case represented by Oscar Mendez, Jr., against Simeon Restaurant Corp, Anson Mill Jv, Llc, represented by Mark D Dore, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Salas-Mendoza, Maria presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 05, 2014 |
CategoryOther Civil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial CANCELED Jury Trial (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Salas-Mendoza, Maria) Other Judge: Salas-Mendoza, Maria |
|
July 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Hearing CANCELED Pre-Trial Hearing (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Salas-Mendoza, Maria) Other Judge: Salas-Mendoza, Maria |
|
July 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Mediation Report Doc ID# 60 | |
July 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Entry of Judgment Hearing CANCELED Entry of Judgment Hearing (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Salas-Mendoza, Maria) Other Judge: Salas-Mendoza, Maria |
|
July 11, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Judgment Sent | |
July 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Order Approving Doc ID# 59 | |
July 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Motion to Dismiss Doc ID# 58 | |
June 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
Entry of Judgment Hearing CANCELED Entry of Judgment Hearing (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Salas-Mendoza, Maria) Reset Judge: Salas-Mendoza, Maria |
|
June 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
Status Conference CANCELED Status Conference (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Salas-Mendoza, Maria) Settled Judge: Salas-Mendoza, Maria |
|
June 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Certificate of Deposition Doc ID# 56 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.