Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wallach-Rhodes, Laurie, Wallach, Adam, filed a(n) Dc Bill Of Review case against Dos Lunas Spirits, Llc, represented by Steven C James, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Enriquez, Sergio H. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 05, 2014 |
CategoryDc Bill Of Review |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice Return | |
December 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial CANCELED Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Enriquez, Sergio H.) Other Judge: Enriquez, Sergio H. |
|
November 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
Final Pre-Trial Hearing CANCELED Final Pre-Trial Hearing (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Enriquez, Sergio H.) Other11/20/2015Reset by Court to 11/30/2015 Judge: Enriquez, Sergio H. |
|
October 16, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Judgment Sent | |
October 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Summary Judgment Hearing (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Enriquez, Sergio H.)
Judge: Enriquez, Sergio H. |
|
September 16, 2015 | Docket Event | Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 15 | |
September 01, 2015 | Docket Event | Certificate of Deposition Doc ID# 14 | |
September 01, 2015 | Docket Event | Certificate of Deposition Doc ID# 13 | |
August 26, 2015 | Docket Event | Motion for Summary Judgment Doc ID# 12 | |
August 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 11 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.