Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Brian Staley, against Elias, Sueann, represented by Burton Irwin Cohen, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Alvarez, Javier presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 05, 2014 |
CategoryContract - Consumer/Commercial/Debt |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeNonsuit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order
Judge: Alvarez, Javier |
|
April 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Alvarez, Javier) Result: Appeared
Judge: Alvarez, Javier |
|
December 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order Under Rule 165a TRCP Doc ID# 9
Judge: Alvarez, Javier |
|
December 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 8
Judge: Alvarez, Javier |
|
December 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Dismiss Want of Prosecution (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Alvarez, Javier) Result: Appeared
Judge: Alvarez, Javier |
|
November 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Dismissal Hearing Doc ID# 7
Judge: Alvarez, Javier |
|
April 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Doc ID# 6
Judge: Alvarez, Javier |
|
December 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
Answer Doc ID# 5
Judge: Alvarez, Javier |
|
December 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
CitationElias, SueannServed12/16/2014Response Received12/18/2014Returned12/19/2014
Judge: Alvarez, Javier |
|
December 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
E-File Event Original Filing
Judge: Alvarez, Javier |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.