Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Nationstar Mortgage Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by William Attmore, against Flores, Cesar A, Flores, Lydia E, Of Property, Occupant, represented by Mario Gonzalez, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Perez, Annabell presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePerez, Annabell Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 04, 2014 |
CategoryForeclosure |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Outcome TypeOrder For Foreclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment Sent
Judge: Perez, Annabell |
|
May 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Foreclosure Hearing (2:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Perez, Annabell)
Judge: Perez, Annabell |
|
April 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Amended Order Doc ID# 10
Judge: Perez, Annabell |
|
April 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice Doc ID# 9
Judge: Perez, Annabell |
|
April 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Doc ID# 8
Judge: Perez, Annabell |
|
February 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Last Address Doc ID# 6
Judge: Perez, Annabell |
|
February 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion to Strike Doc ID# 5
Judge: Perez, Annabell |
|
February 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Doc ID# 7
Judge: Perez, Annabell |
|
December 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
Answer Doc ID# 4
Judge: Perez, Annabell |
|
December 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
CitationOF PROPERTY, OCCUPANTServed12/09/2014Response Due01/05/2015Returned12/10/2014FLORES, CESAR AServed12/09/2014Response Due01/05/2015Returned12/10/2014FLORES, LYNDIA EServed12/09/2014Response Due01/05/2015Returned12/12/2014
Judge: Perez, Annabell |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.