Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Retana-Love, Hilda, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by George P Andritsos, against Centro San Vicente Familiar De Salud, Centro San Vicente, represented by David Driscoll, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Barill, Angie Juarez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBarill, Angie Juarez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 04, 2014 |
CategoryWrongful Termination |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
Case Outcome TypeOrder For Non-Suit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion for Non Suit Doc ID# 9
Judge: Barill, Angie Juarez |
|
March 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
Answer Doc ID# 8
Judge: Barill, Angie Juarez |
|
March 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order Doc ID# 6
Judge: Barill, Angie Juarez |
|
March 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Rule 11 Doc ID# 5
Judge: Barill, Angie Juarez |
|
February 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion for New Trial Doc ID# 4
Judge: Barill, Angie Juarez |
|
December 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
CitationCentro San VicenteServed12/12/2014Response Received03/19/2015Returned12/15/2014Centro San Vicente Familiar De SaludServed12/12/2014Response Due01/05/2015Returned12/15/2014
Judge: Barill, Angie Juarez |
|
December 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) Doc ID# 1
Judge: Barill, Angie Juarez |
|
December 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
E-File Event Original Filing
Judge: Barill, Angie Juarez |
|
December 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Case Information Sheet Doc ID# 2
Judge: Barill, Angie Juarez |
|
December 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Jury Demand Doc ID# 3
Judge: Barill, Angie Juarez |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.