Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gimblet, Yadira, Arteaga, Yadira, A., A., filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Ramona N. Frazier, against Bejarano, Maria B., represented by Wayne Windle, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Garcia, Patrick M. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGarcia, Patrick M. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 04, 2014 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Accounting Release of Funds
Judge: Garcia, Patrick M. |
|
December 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order to Release Funds
Judge: Garcia, Patrick M. |
|
June 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Accounting Letter Doc ID# 13
Judge: Garcia, Patrick M. |
|
July 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment Sent
Judge: Garcia, Patrick M. |
|
July 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
Friendly Suit (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Garcia, Patrick M.)
Judge: Garcia, Patrick M. |
|
July 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem Doc ID# 12
Judge: Garcia, Patrick M. |
|
July 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
Application to Invest Funds Doc ID# 10
Judge: Garcia, Patrick M. |
|
July 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order to Invest Funds Doc ID# 11
Judge: Garcia, Patrick M. |
|
July 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
Report of Guardian Ad Litem (OCA) Doc ID# 9
Judge: Garcia, Patrick M. |
|
June 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Friendly Suit CANCELED Friendly Suit (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Garcia, Patrick M.) Reset04/08/2015Reset by Court to 06/17/2015 Judge: Garcia, Patrick M. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.