Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hernandez, Josefina M., filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Jeffrey W Mcelroy, against Belt Con Construction, Inc., represented by Richard Bonner, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Lizarraga, Marcos presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLizarraga, Marcos Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 03, 2014 |
CategoryWrongful Termination |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
Case Outcome TypeNotice Of Removal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice Doc ID# 10
Judge: Lizarraga, Marcos |
|
May 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
Plea to Jurisdiction Hearing CANCELED Plea to Jurisdiction Hearing (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Lizarraga, Marcos) Other Judge: Lizarraga, Marcos |
|
April 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Amended Petition Doc ID# 9
Judge: Lizarraga, Marcos |
|
March 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 8
Judge: Lizarraga, Marcos |
|
March 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Doc ID# 7
Judge: Lizarraga, Marcos |
|
March 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Plea to the Jurisdiction Doc ID# 6
Judge: Lizarraga, Marcos |
|
February 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service Doc ID# 4
Judge: Lizarraga, Marcos |
|
February 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Answer Doc ID# 5
Judge: Lizarraga, Marcos |
|
December 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
CitationBelt Con Construction, Inc.Served02/10/2015Response Received02/16/2015Returned02/20/2015
Judge: Lizarraga, Marcos |
|
December 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
E-File Event Original Filing
Judge: Lizarraga, Marcos |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.