Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Rey Soto, Hector Adrian, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Ramona N. Frazier, against The City Of El Paso, represented by Wayne Windle, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Aguilar, Luis presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAguilar, Luis Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 03, 2014 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeDismissal With Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Deposition Doc ID# 25
Judge: Aguilar, Luis |
|
May 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment Sent
Judge: Aguilar, Luis |
|
May 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Entry of Judgment Hearing (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Aguilar, Luis)
Judge: Aguilar, Luis |
|
May 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment Sent
Judge: Aguilar, Luis |
|
May 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion Doc ID# 24
Judge: Aguilar, Luis |
|
May 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 23
Judge: Aguilar, Luis |
|
May 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Status Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Aguilar, Luis)
Judge: Aguilar, Luis |
|
April 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 22
Judge: Aguilar, Luis |
|
April 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
Status Hearing (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Aguilar, Luis)
Judge: Aguilar, Luis |
|
March 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Deposition Doc ID# 20
Judge: Aguilar, Luis |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.