Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Aldaz, Betha, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by James B Kennedy, against Progressive County Mutual Insurance Company, represented by Ruben Robles, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Alvarez, Javier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAlvarez, Javier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 03, 2014 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Dismiss Want of Prosecution CANCELED Dismiss Want of Prosecution (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Alvarez, Javier) Dismissed Judge: Alvarez, Javier |
|
August 02, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Dismissal Hearing Doc ID# 29 | |
January 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion to Quash Hearing CANCELED Motion to Quash Hearing (3:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Alvarez, Javier) Agreed Judge: Alvarez, Javier |
|
December 24, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Change Doc ID# 28 | |
December 03, 2015 | Docket Event | Order for Severance Doc ID# 27 | |
November 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 26 | |
November 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Motion to Quash Doc ID# 25 | |
November 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion to Sever Hearing CANCELED Motion to Sever Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Alvarez, Javier) Agreed Judge: Alvarez, Javier |
|
November 05, 2015 | Docket Event | Subpoena Return by Attorney Doc ID# 24 | |
October 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Doc ID# 22 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.