Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Diaz, Javier, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by David P Wilson, against Aguilar, Oscar Alberto, Allstate Texas Lloyds, represented by Roger D. Higgins, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Moody, William E. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMoody, William E. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 03, 2014 |
CategoryContract - Consumer/Commercial/Debt |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeDismissal With Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment Sent
Judge: Moody, William E. |
|
August 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Agreed Motion Doc ID# 7
Judge: Moody, William E. |
|
January 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Answer Doc ID# 6
Judge: Moody, William E. |
|
January 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Answer Doc ID# 5
Judge: Moody, William E. |
|
December 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
CitationALLSTATE TEXAS LLOYDSServed12/12/2014Response Received01/05/2015Returned12/17/2014AGUILAR, OSCAR ALBERTOServed12/11/2014Response Received01/05/2015Returned12/11/2014
Judge: Moody, William E. |
|
December 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
E-File Event Original Filing
Judge: Moody, William E. |
|
December 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Jury Demand Doc ID# 3
Judge: Moody, William E. |
|
December 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) Doc ID# 1
Judge: Moody, William E. |
|
December 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Case Information Sheet Doc ID# 2
Judge: Moody, William E. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.