Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Evolve Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Lane C Reedman, against Cavazos, Christopher Scott, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Dominguez, Francisco X. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 28, 2014 |
CategoryContract - Consumer/Commercial/Debt |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeDismissal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Suggestion of Bankruptcy Doc ID# 7
Judge: Dominguez, Francisco X. |
|
March 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment Sent
Judge: Dominguez, Francisco X. |
|
February 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
DWOP Hearing (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Dominguez, Francisco X.)
Judge: Dominguez, Francisco X. |
|
January 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent to Dismiss for Want of Prosecution Doc ID# 5
Judge: Dominguez, Francisco X. |
|
January 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Dismissal Hearing Doc ID# 6
Judge: Dominguez, Francisco X. |
|
September 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion for Substitute Service Doc ID# 2
Judge: Dominguez, Francisco X. |
|
July 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
CitationCavazos, Christopher Scott Returned Unserved 01/20/2015Returned01/20/2015
Judge: Dominguez, Francisco X. |
|
June 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
E-File Event Original Filing
Judge: Dominguez, Francisco X. |
|
June 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) Doc ID# 1
Judge: Dominguez, Francisco X. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.