Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Pedroza, Jose Rene, Jr., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Pedroza, Michele Elaine, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Strathmann, Laura presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStrathmann, Laura Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 04, 2014 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
Uncontested Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Strathmann, Laura)
Judge: Strathmann, Laura |
|
August 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
Decree of Divorce Doc ID# 15 (Judicial Officer: Leverton, Reed )
Judge: : Leverton, Reed |
|
August 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Certificate of Completion - Cope for Divorce Class Doc ID# 14 | |
August 07, 2015 | Docket Event | Certificate of Completion Doc ID# 13 | |
August 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Certificate of Completion - Cope for Divorce Class Doc ID# 12 | |
July 24, 2015 | Docket Event | Certificate of Completion Doc ID# 11 | |
July 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Waiver of Service Doc ID# 10 | |
July 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice Setting Hearing Doc ID# 9 (Judicial Officer: Strathmann, Laura )
Judge: : Strathmann, Laura |
|
June 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Dismiss Want of Prosecution (3:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Strathmann, Laura)
Judge: Strathmann, Laura |
|
May 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent Dismiss Doc ID# 8 (Judicial Officer: Strathmann, Laura )
Judge: : Strathmann, Laura |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.