Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Office Of The Attorney General, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Rodriguez, Antonio presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 05, 2014 |
CategoryTitle Iv-D Child Support Review Order - Paternity |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeOrder For Enforcement |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
FRD-FEE-CIV
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
October 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Rodriguez, Antonio)
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
October 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order to Enforce Doc ID# 11 (Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Antonio )
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
September 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Waiver of Service Doc ID# 10
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
August 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
CitationTOVAR, JOSE LUISServed10/03/2015Response Due10/26/2015Returned10/05/2015
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
August 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Precept to ServeTOVAR, JOSE LUISServed10/03/2015Response Due10/26/2015Returned10/05/2015
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
August 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order to Appear
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
August 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
Case Information Sheet Doc ID# 8
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
August 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion to Modify/Enforcement AG
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
December 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order for Support Doc ID# 7
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.