Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Sanchez, Maria Lidia, Gonzalez, Rene, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Sanchez, Maria Lidia, Gonzalez, Rene, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Strathmann, Laura presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStrathmann, Laura Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 04, 2014 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Enforcement Hearing (2:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Anderson, Kathleen)
Judge: Anderson, Kathleen |
|
June 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Answer to Motion to Enforce Doc ID# 65 | |
June 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Continuance Doc ID# 64 (Judicial Officer: Anderson, Kathleen )
Judge: : Anderson, Kathleen |
|
June 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Enforcement Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Anderson, Kathleen) Result: Continued
Judge: Anderson, Kathleen |
|
June 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion for Continuance Doc ID# 63 | |
June 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Entry of Appearance Doc ID# 62 | |
June 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice to Show CauseGONZALEZ, RENEServed06/16/2020Response Received06/22/2020Returned06/17/2020 | |
June 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Request Doc ID# 61 | |
May 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order to Appear (Judicial Officer: Anderson, Kathleen )
Judge: : Anderson, Kathleen |
|
May 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Enforcement Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Anderson, Kathleen) Result: Continued
Judge: Anderson, Kathleen |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.