Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by State Of Texas, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Rodriguez, Antonio presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 05, 2014 |
CategoryTitle Iv-D Parent Child |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeDismissal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Rodriguez, Antonio) 02/03/2015Reset by Court to 02/24/2015
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
CitationGANDAR, JENNIFERServed02/25/2015Response Due03/23/2015Returned03/16/2015
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Precept to ServeGANDAR, JENNIFERServed02/25/2015Response Due03/23/2015Returned03/16/2015
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
February 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 7 (Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Antonio )
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
January 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
CitationURDIALEZ, MARK ANTHONY, Jr.Served02/02/2015Response Due02/23/2015Returned03/06/2015
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
January 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Precept to ServeURDIALEZ, MARK ANTHONY, Jr.Served02/02/2015Response Due02/23/2015Returned03/06/2015
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
January 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
CitationGANDAR, JENNIFER Returned Unserved 02/06/2015Returned02/06/2015
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
January 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Precept to ServeGANDAR, JENNIFER Returned Unserved 02/06/2015Returned02/06/2015
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
December 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 4
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
December 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
Case Information Sheet Doc ID# 3
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.