Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Reyna, Tricia Marie, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Reyna, Miguel, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Pelletier, Karen A. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePelletier, Karen A. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 04, 2014 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed For Want Of Prosecution |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment Sent
Judge: Pelletier, Karen A. |
|
August 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Doc ID# 7 (Judicial Officer: Pelletier, Karen A. )
Judge: Pelletier, Karen A. |
|
August 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Court Status Check (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Herrera, Mike)
Judge: Pelletier, Karen A. |
|
August 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
DWOP Hearing (2:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Pelletier, Karen A.) Result: Dismissed
Judge: Pelletier, Karen A. |
|
July 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent to Dismiss for Want of Prosecution Doc ID# 6 (Judicial Officer: Pelletier, Karen A. )
Judge: Pelletier, Karen A. |
|
December 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
CitationREYNA, MIGUEL Unserved
Judge: Pelletier, Karen A. |
|
December 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice to All Parties Filing Pro Se Doc ID# 5
Judge: Pelletier, Karen A. |
|
December 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Petition for Divorce Doc ID# 1
Judge: Pelletier, Karen A. |
|
December 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice Doc ID# 4
Judge: Pelletier, Karen A. |
|
December 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Case Information Sheet Doc ID# 2
Judge: Pelletier, Karen A. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.