Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Meza, Cesar, Meza, Armida, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Vargas, Juan F, Campos, Perla S, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Leverton, Reed presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLeverton, Reed Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 03, 2014 |
CategoryParent Child - Non-Divorce |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
Parent Child Relationship Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Leverton, Reed)
Judge: Leverton, Reed |
|
March 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
Finding of Fact Doc ID# 7 (Judicial Officer: Leverton, Reed )
Judge: Leverton, Reed |
|
January 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice Setting Hearing Doc ID# 6 (Judicial Officer: Leverton, Reed )
Judge: Leverton, Reed |
|
January 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order Appointing Doc ID# 5 (Judicial Officer: Leverton, Reed )
Judge: Leverton, Reed |
|
December 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion for Appointment Doc ID# 4
Judge: Leverton, Reed |
|
December 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
Referral Order Doc ID# 3 (Judicial Officer: Strathmann, Laura )
Judge: Leverton, Reed |
|
December 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Petition in Suit Affecting Parent-Child Relationship Doc ID# 1
Judge: Leverton, Reed |
|
December 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
E-File Event Original Filing
Judge: Leverton, Reed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.