Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Williams, Paris Ikoya, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Jones, Lopez Orlando, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Strathmann, Laura presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStrathmann, Laura Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 04, 2014 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed For Want Of Prosecution |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Doc ID# 12
Judge: Strathmann, Laura |
|
February 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment Sent
Judge: Strathmann, Laura |
|
February 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Dismiss Want of Prosecution (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Strathmann, Laura)
Judge: Strathmann, Laura |
|
January 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent to Dismiss for Want of Prosecution Doc ID# 10 (Judicial Officer: Strathmann, Laura )
Judge: Strathmann, Laura |
|
June 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Dismiss Want of Prosecution (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Strathmann, Laura)
Judge: Strathmann, Laura |
|
May 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Doc ID# 9
Judge: Strathmann, Laura |
|
May 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent Dismiss Doc ID# 8 (Judicial Officer: Strathmann, Laura )
Judge: Strathmann, Laura |
|
December 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
Referral Order Doc ID# 7
Judge: Strathmann, Laura |
|
December 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Pauper's Oath Doc ID# 2
Judge: Strathmann, Laura |
|
December 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice to All Parties Filing Pro Se Doc ID# 5
Judge: Strathmann, Laura |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.