Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bishop, Imar Dakeem, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Bishop, Alicia Marie, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Strathmann, Laura presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStrathmann, Laura Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 03, 2014 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeDismissal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Doc ID# 14
Judge: Strathmann, Laura |
|
January 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Doc ID# 13 (Judicial Officer: Strathmann, Laura )
Judge: Strathmann, Laura |
|
January 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Dismiss Want of Prosecution (11:15 AM) (Judicial Officer Strathmann, Laura)
Judge: Strathmann, Laura |
|
December 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent Dismiss Doc ID# 12 (Judicial Officer: Strathmann, Laura )
Judge: Strathmann, Laura |
|
June 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
Dismiss Want of Prosecution (11:15 AM) (Judicial Officer Strathmann, Laura)
Judge: Strathmann, Laura |
|
May 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Doc ID# 11
Judge: Strathmann, Laura |
|
May 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent Dismiss Doc ID# 10 (Judicial Officer: Strathmann, Laura )
Judge: Strathmann, Laura |
|
December 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
CitationBISHOP, ALICIA MARIE Returned Unserved 01/26/2015Returned01/26/2015
Judge: Strathmann, Laura |
|
December 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
Receipt Doc ID# 9
Judge: Strathmann, Laura |
|
December 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
Referral Order Doc ID# 8 (Judicial Officer: Strathmann, Laura )
Judge: Strathmann, Laura |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.