Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gonzalez, Griselda, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Gonzalez, Benjamin, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Strathmann, Laura presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStrathmann, Laura Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 03, 2014 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Doc ID# 14 (Judicial Officer: Strathmann, Laura )
Judge: : Strathmann, Laura |
|
January 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Dismiss Want of Prosecution (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Strathmann, Laura)
Judge: Strathmann, Laura |
|
December 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent Dismiss Doc ID# 13 (Judicial Officer: Strathmann, Laura )
Judge: : Strathmann, Laura |
|
July 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
Status Conference (11:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Strathmann, Laura)
Judge: Strathmann, Laura |
|
July 22, 2015 | Docket Event | Entry of Appearance Doc ID# 12 | |
July 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice Setting Hearing Doc ID# 11 (Judicial Officer: Strathmann, Laura )
Judge: : Strathmann, Laura |
|
June 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Dismiss Want of Prosecution (11:15 AM) (Judicial Officer Strathmann, Laura)
Judge: Strathmann, Laura |
|
May 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent Dismiss Doc ID# 10 (Judicial Officer: Strathmann, Laura )
Judge: : Strathmann, Laura |
|
December 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
Referral Order Doc ID# 9 (Judicial Officer: Strathmann, Laura )
Judge: : Strathmann, Laura |
|
December 04, 2014 | Docket Event | Receipt Doc ID# 8 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.