Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Martinez, Marissa, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Wood, Jose Ramon, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with : Locke, Michele L. presiding.
Case Number |
Judge: Locke, Michele L. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 03, 2014 |
CategoryProtective Orders |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 13, 2015 | Docket Event | Copy Doc ID# 10 | |
January 12, 2015 | Docket Event | Information Sheet Doc ID# 9 | |
January 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Protective Order Hearing (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gonzalez, Jose M) Result: Agreed
Judge: Gonzalez, Jose M |
|
December 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Answer Doc ID# 7 | |
December 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Protective OrderWOOD, JOSE RAMONServed12/19/2014Response Due01/12/2015Returned12/30/2014 | |
December 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order Extending Protective Order Doc ID# 6 (Judicial Officer: Locke, Michele L. )
Judge: : Locke, Michele L. |
|
December 11, 2014 | Docket Event | Protective Order Hearing (3:00 PM) () Result: Reset | |
December 04, 2014 | Docket Event | Protective OrderWOOD, JOSE RAMON Returned Unserved 12/12/2014Returned12/12/2014 | |
December 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Hearing (2:27 PM) () Result: Granted | |
December 03, 2014 | Docket Event | E-File Event Original Filing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.