Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by State Of Texas, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Rodriguez, Antonio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRodriguez, Antonio Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 03, 2014 |
CategoryTitle Iv-D Paternity |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeDismissal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 12, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Rodriguez, Antonio) 01/29/2015Reset by Court to 03/12/2015
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
February 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Precept to ServeWRIGHT, LEONARD MAURICE Returned Unserved 04/22/2015Returned04/22/2015
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
February 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
CitationWRIGHT, LEONARD MAURICE Returned Unserved 04/22/2015Returned04/22/2015
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
January 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 5 (Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Antonio )
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
January 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Precept to ServeWRIGHT, LEONARD MAURICE Returned Unserved 02/13/2015Returned02/13/2015
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
January 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
CitationWRIGHT, LEONARD MAURICE Returned Unserved 02/13/2015Returned02/13/2015
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
December 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 3
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
December 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Case Information Sheet Doc ID# 2
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
December 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Petition for Paternity Doc ID# 1
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.