Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Office Of The Attorney General, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Gonzalez, Phyllis presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGonzalez, Phyllis Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 03, 2014 |
CategoryTitle Iv-D Parent Child |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Order |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
FRD-FEE-CIV
Judge: Gonzalez, Phyllis |
|
September 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
FRD Standard Plan
Judge: Gonzalez, Phyllis |
|
May 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Gonzalez, Phyllis)
Judge: Gonzalez, Phyllis |
|
May 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order Doc ID# 13 (Judicial Officer: Gonzalez, Phyllis )
Judge: Gonzalez, Phyllis |
|
May 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Waiver of Service Doc ID# 12
Judge: Gonzalez, Phyllis |
|
March 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 10 (Judicial Officer: Gonzalez, Phyllis )
Judge: Gonzalez, Phyllis |
|
March 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
Precept to ServePEREZ-HERRERA, ANTONIO, Jr.Served04/17/2017Response Due05/08/2017Returned04/24/2017
Judge: Gonzalez, Phyllis |
|
March 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
CitationPEREZ-HERRERA, ANTONIO, Jr.Served04/17/2017Response Due05/08/2017Returned04/24/2017
Judge: Gonzalez, Phyllis |
|
March 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Case Information Sheet Doc ID# 9
Judge: Gonzalez, Phyllis |
|
March 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion to Modify/Enforcement AG
Judge: Gonzalez, Phyllis |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.