Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by State Of Texas, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Gonzalez, Phyllis presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGonzalez, Phyllis Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 03, 2014 |
CategoryTitle Iv-D Paternity |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Default Judgment Doc ID# 15
Judge: Gonzalez, Phyllis |
|
June 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Last Address Doc ID# 14
Judge: Gonzalez, Phyllis |
|
June 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment
Judge: Gonzalez, Phyllis |
|
June 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Gonzalez, Phyllis) 01/29/2015Reset by Court to 03/24/201503/24/2015Reset by Court to 04/23/201504/23/2015Reset by Court to 06/09/201506/09/2015Reset by Court to 06/23/2015
Judge: Gonzalez, Phyllis |
|
June 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
Evaluation Filed Doc ID# 13
Judge: Gonzalez, Phyllis |
|
June 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent Dismiss Doc ID# 12 (Judicial Officer: Gonzalez, Phyllis )
Judge: Gonzalez, Phyllis |
|
June 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
Letter Doc ID# 11
Judge: Gonzalez, Phyllis |
|
April 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent Dismiss Doc ID# 9 (Judicial Officer: Gonzalez, Phyllis )
Judge: Gonzalez, Phyllis |
|
April 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order for Paternity Test Doc ID# 10 (Judicial Officer: Gonzalez, Phyllis )
Judge: Gonzalez, Phyllis |
|
March 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent Dismiss Doc ID# 8 (Judicial Officer: Gonzalez, Phyllis )
Judge: Gonzalez, Phyllis |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.