Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Office Of The Attorney General, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Herrera, Mike presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHerrera, Mike Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 03, 2014 |
CategoryTitle Iv-D Paternity |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing CANCELED Motion Hearing (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Gonzalez, Phyllis) Non-Suit01/30/2018Reset by Court to 03/27/201803/27/2018Reset by Court to 04/03/201804/03/2018Reset by Court to 05/08/2018 Judge: Gonzalez, Phyllis |
|
April 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Non-Suit Doc ID# 22 | |
April 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 21 (Judicial Officer: Gonzalez, Phyllis )
Judge: : Gonzalez, Phyllis |
|
February 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 20 (Judicial Officer: Gonzalez, Phyllis )
Judge: : Gonzalez, Phyllis |
|
January 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Order | |
December 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Precept to ServeHERNANDEZ, BETTINA MServed12/20/2017Response Due01/15/2018Returned12/26/2017 | |
December 08, 2017 | Docket Event | CitationHERNANDEZ, BETTINA MServed12/20/2017Response Due01/15/2018Returned12/26/2017 | |
December 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 18 (Judicial Officer: Gonzalez, Phyllis )
Judge: : Gonzalez, Phyllis |
|
November 29, 2017 | Docket Event | Motion to Modify/Enforcement AG | |
November 29, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Information Sheet Doc ID# 17 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.