Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Runyon, Andrew Steven, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Rivera-Hidrogo, Manuela Arlina, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with : Strathmann, Laura presiding.
Case Number |
Judge: Strathmann, Laura Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 02, 2014 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
Uncontested Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Leverton, Reed)
Judge: Leverton, Reed |
|
April 27, 2015 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service Doc ID# 14 | |
March 20, 2015 | Docket Event | CitationRIVERA-HIDROGO, MANUELA ARLINAServed03/23/2015Response Due04/13/2015Returned04/27/2015 | |
February 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order for Alternate Service Doc ID# 12 (Judicial Officer: Leverton, Reed )
Judge: : Leverton, Reed |
|
February 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Motion for Alternative Service Doc ID# 11 | |
February 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Amended Petition Doc ID# 10 | |
December 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
Referral Order Doc ID# 8 (Judicial Officer: Strathmann, Laura )
Judge: : Strathmann, Laura |
|
December 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice to all Persons Filing a Law Suit Doc ID# 5 | |
December 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Screening Instrument Doc ID# 3 | |
December 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Petition for Divorce Doc ID# 1 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.