Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hernandez, Ylusion, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Morales, Daniel S., in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with : Aboud, Gary presiding.
Case Number |
Judge: Aboud, Gary Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 14, 2014 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing CANCELED Final Hearing (3:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Strathmann, Laura) Court Coordinator Discretionary Cancellation Judge: Strathmann, Laura |
|
January 16, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Non-Suit Doc ID# 15 | |
January 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order Permitting Withdrawl of Counsel Doc ID# 14 (Judicial Officer: Leverton, Reed )
Judge: : Leverton, Reed |
|
December 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order Permitting Withdrawl of Counsel Doc ID# 13 (Judicial Officer: Strathmann, Laura )
Judge: : Strathmann, Laura |
|
December 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion to Withdraw Attorney (4:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Leverton, Reed)
Judge: Leverton, Reed |
|
December 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Hearing (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Strathmann, Laura)
Judge: Strathmann, Laura |
|
December 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
Hearing Request Form Doc ID# 12 (Judicial Officer: Leverton, Reed )
Judge: : Leverton, Reed |
|
December 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Motion to Withdraw Doc ID# 11 | |
November 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Hearing Request Form Doc ID# 10 (Judicial Officer: Strathmann, Laura )
Judge: : Strathmann, Laura |
|
November 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Hearing Request Form Doc ID# 9 (Judicial Officer: Aboud, Gary )
Judge: : Aboud, Gary |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.