Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gamez, Jessica C., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Gamez, Joey R., in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Aboud, Gary presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAboud, Gary Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 12, 2014 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Divorce Decree |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Dismiss Want of Prosecution (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Strathmann, Laura)
Judge: Aboud, Gary |
|
June 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Domestic Relations Order Doc ID# 13 (Judicial Officer: Strathmann, Laura )
Judge: Aboud, Gary |
|
June 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Dismissal Hearing Doc ID# 12
Judge: Aboud, Gary |
|
June 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent to Dismiss for Want of Prosecution Doc ID# 11 (Judicial Officer: Strathmann, Laura )
Judge: Aboud, Gary |
|
June 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Scheduling Conference (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Strathmann, Laura) Result: No Show
Judge: Aboud, Gary |
|
May 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice Setting Hearing Doc ID# 10 (Judicial Officer: Strathmann, Laura )
Judge: Aboud, Gary |
|
January 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Doc ID# 9 (Judicial Officer: Strathmann, Laura )
Judge: Aboud, Gary |
|
December 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion Doc ID# 8
Judge: Aboud, Gary |
|
December 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order to Transfer Doc ID# 7 (Judicial Officer: Strathmann, Laura )
Judge: Aboud, Gary |
|
November 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Decree of Divorce by Default
Judge: Aboud, Gary |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.