Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Faulhaber, Jeremy, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Faulhaber, Amber, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with : Aboud, Gary presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2014 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Decree of Divorce Doc ID# 22 (Judicial Officer: Strathmann, Laura )
Judge: : Strathmann, Laura |
|
February 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
Entry of Judgment Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Strathmann, Laura) 02/11/2016Reset by Court to 02/25/2016
Judge: Strathmann, Laura |
|
February 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice Setting Hearing Doc ID# 21 (Judicial Officer: Strathmann, Laura )
Judge: : Strathmann, Laura |
|
January 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice Setting Hearing Doc ID# 20 (Judicial Officer: Strathmann, Laura )
Judge: : Strathmann, Laura |
|
January 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Entry of Judgment Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Strathmann, Laura)
Judge: Strathmann, Laura |
|
January 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice Setting Hearing Doc ID# 19 (Judicial Officer: Strathmann, Laura )
Judge: : Strathmann, Laura |
|
January 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
Entry of Judgment Hearing CANCELED Entry of Judgment Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Strathmann, Laura) Cancelled Pending Reset Judge: Strathmann, Laura |
|
December 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Findings and Rulings | |
November 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Certificate of Completion - Cope for Divorce Class Doc ID# 18 | |
November 16, 2015 | Docket Event | Certificate of Completion - Cope for Divorce Class Doc ID# 17 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.