Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by State Of Texas, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with : Gonzalez, Phyllis presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 27, 2014 |
CategoryTitle Iv-D Parent Child |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Gonzalez, Phyllis) 08/21/2014Reset by Court to 10/20/201410/20/2014Reset by Court to 11/19/2014
Judge: Gonzalez, Phyllis |
|
November 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Doc ID# 11 (Judicial Officer: Gonzalez, Phyllis )
Judge: : Gonzalez, Phyllis |
|
October 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent Dismiss Doc ID# 10 (Judicial Officer: Gonzalez, Phyllis )
Judge: : Gonzalez, Phyllis |
|
August 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 8 (Judicial Officer: Gonzalez, Phyllis )
Judge: : Gonzalez, Phyllis |
|
August 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Health Insurance Availability Form Doc ID# 9 | |
August 01, 2014 | Docket Event | Precept to ServeMEDINA JR, JOSE OMAR Returned Unserved 08/22/2014Returned08/22/2014 | |
August 01, 2014 | Docket Event | CitationMEDINA JR, JOSE OMAR Returned Unserved 08/22/2014Returned08/22/2014 | |
August 01, 2014 | Docket Event | CitationALVARADO, PRISCILLA LEEServed08/09/2014Response Due09/01/2014Returned08/18/2014 | |
August 01, 2014 | Docket Event | Precept to ServeALVARADO, PRISCILLA LEEServed08/09/2014Response Due09/01/2014Returned08/18/2014 | |
July 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 5 (Judicial Officer: Gonzalez, Phyllis )
Judge: : Gonzalez, Phyllis |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.