Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Rasool, Rebecca, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Rasool, Omarr Farid, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with : Strathmann, Laura presiding.
Case Number |
Judge: Strathmann, Laura Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 14, 2014 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 29, 2015 | Docket Event | Returned Mail Doc ID# 10 | |
December 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Doc ID# 9 (Judicial Officer: Strathmann, Laura )
Judge: : Strathmann, Laura |
|
December 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Dismiss Want of Prosecution (2:45 PM) (Judicial Officer Strathmann, Laura) Result: Dismissed
Judge: Strathmann, Laura |
|
October 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent Dismiss Doc ID# 8 (Judicial Officer: Strathmann, Laura )
Judge: : Strathmann, Laura |
|
January 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order to Transfer Doc ID# 7 (Judicial Officer: Strathmann, Laura )
Judge: : Strathmann, Laura |
|
May 14, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Screening Instrument Doc ID# 4 | |
May 14, 2014 | Docket Event | Petition for Divorce Doc ID# 1 | |
May 14, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Information Sheet Doc ID# 3 | |
May 14, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice to all Persons Filing a Law Suit Doc ID# 6 | |
May 14, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice to All Parties Filing Pro Se Doc ID# 5 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.