Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Jo Anne Bernal filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case against Quinteros, Melissa, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 03, 2014 |
CategoryBond Forfeiture |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event | AbstractQUINTEROS, MELISSA Unserved | |
January 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Request Doc ID# 5 | |
January 16, 2015 | Docket Event | Bill of Cost Doc ID# 4 | |
December 08, 2014 | Docket Event | CitationQUINTEROS, MELISSA Unserved | |
December 08, 2014 | Docket Event | CitationQUINTEROS, MELISSAServed12/10/2014Response Due01/05/2015Returned12/10/2014 | |
December 04, 2014 | Docket Event | Certificate of Bailiff Doc ID# 3 | |
December 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Information Sheet Doc ID# 2 | |
December 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Judgment Nisi (OCA) Doc ID# 1 | |
December 03, 2014 | Docket Event | E-File Event Original Filing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.