Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Silva, Guadalupe, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Torres, Paul, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Strathmann, Laura presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2013 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Temporary Orders Hearing CANCELED Temporary Orders Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Strathmann, Laura) Court Coordinator Discretionary Cancellation Judge: Strathmann, Laura |
|
March 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancelling Hearing Doc ID# 84 | |
March 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice Setting Hearing Doc ID# 83 (Judicial Officer: Strathmann, Laura )
Judge: : Strathmann, Laura |
|
March 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice Setting Hearing Doc ID# 82 (Judicial Officer: Strathmann, Laura )
Judge: : Strathmann, Laura |
|
March 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Order to Correct | |
March 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Temporary Orders Hearing (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Strathmann, Laura) 12/19/2019Reset by Court to 02/10/202002/10/2020Reset by Court to 03/09/2020 Result: Reset
Judge: Strathmann, Laura |
|
February 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice Setting Hearing Doc ID# 81 (Judicial Officer: Strathmann, Laura )
Judge: : Strathmann, Laura |
|
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Hearing Request Form Doc ID# 80 (Judicial Officer: Strathmann, Laura )
Judge: : Strathmann, Laura |
|
November 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Status Conference (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Strathmann, Laura) Result: Appeared
Judge: Strathmann, Laura |
|
October 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Hearing Request Form Doc ID# 79 (Judicial Officer: Strathmann, Laura )
Judge: : Strathmann, Laura |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.